U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00469
  • Case Name: PERSONAL SERVICES CONTRACTOR ASSOCIATION v. TRUMP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 26, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.