U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00697
  • Case Name: KHAN v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.