U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00636
  • Case Name: PROPST v. BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MULTIFAMILY LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.