U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02474
  • Case Name: KEESE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 26a2 Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.