U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03491
  • Case Name: CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.