U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00283
  • Case Name: NZIHOU v. DEFENSE CONTRACTING MANAGEMENT AGENCY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.