U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03244
  • Case Name: WEISER et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.