U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-02203
  • Case Name: NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION et al v. HAALAND et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.