U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00405
  • Case Name: GOMPEL v. STATE OF TEXAS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 12, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Transferring Pro Se Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.