U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANCHEZ-PUENTES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Transfer Out]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.