U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02422
  • Case Name: IN RE DANIELLE ELEISE PENNINGTON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.