U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.