U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00312
  • Case Name: DOE v. UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 15, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.