U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00632
  • Case Name: DOE v. CHIEF JUDGE OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.