U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03007
  • Case Name: COBBLE v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Contempt]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Issue Subpoena]
  • March 26, 2025: [Injunction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 11, 2025: [Contempt]
  • March 11, 2025: [Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.