U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00644
  • Case Name: LYALL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 13, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reopen Case]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.