U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00102
  • Case Name: MWIMANZI v. UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Mayor for DC]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.