U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00605
  • Case Name: CATHOLIC CHARITIES DIOCESE OF FORTH WORTH, INC. v. DHHS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.