U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00714
  • Case Name: GOBER et al v. COLLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 08, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 08, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 27, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.