U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00383
  • Case Name: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.