U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02970
  • Case Name: SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Surreply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.