U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00696
  • Case Name: PUEBLO OF ISLETA et al v. SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.