U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00223
  • Case Name: EXPOVISION, INC. v. PLASTICS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 27, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.