U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02907
  • Case Name: KIDECKEL v. FOREIGN NATION OF CANADA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Hold in Abeyance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • March 20, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.