U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00471
  • Case Name: NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.