U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00390
  • Case Name: ARNOLD v. HOLMES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 20, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Military Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit for Default]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 11, 2025: [Military Affidavit]
  • March 11, 2025: [Affidavit for Default]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.