U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03463
  • Case Name: NALWADE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.