U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00381
  • Case Name: NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION v. VOUGHT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 29, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 27, 2025: [Substitute]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Suggestion of Death]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.