U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00418
  • Case Name: LAS AMERICAS IMMIGRANT ADVOCACY CENTER et al v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 26, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.