U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00698
  • Case Name: CLIMATE UNITED FUND v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 24, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 05, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Remark- Consolidation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.