U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00313
  • Case Name: ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS et al v. BESSENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • May 01, 2025: [Modify]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 03, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Administrative Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.