U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00088-
  • Case Name: Andrew Richard Sharp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order for Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Affidavit]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount/Reclassification]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.