U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00719
  • Case Name: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.