U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00346
  • Case Name: STEFAN v. US SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND (USSOCOM) et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.