U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03382
  • Case Name: BRUNSON v. HOM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion For Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 04, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.