U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02924
  • Case Name: ZAHEDI v. PALLUCONI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.