U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01316
  • Case Name: BUSSMAN v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 26a1 Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Rule 26a1 Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.