U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00013-
  • Case Name: Steven Lewyllen Watkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order for Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.