U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00539
  • Case Name: NAVARDI et al v. BLINKEN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Civil Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.