U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00532
  • Case Name: ASSOCIATED PRESS v. BUDOWICH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enforce ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Enforce]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.