U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03116
  • Case Name: PREMIER, INC. v. HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Administrative Record]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 25, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.