U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01857
  • Case Name: HISTORY ASSOCIATES INCORPORATED v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Relief from Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Lift Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 11, 2025: [Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.