U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03687
  • Case Name: HETTINGER v. BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.