U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00322
  • Case Name: DOCTORS FOR AMERICA et al v. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.