U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00287-
  • Case Name: Delores Ford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order - Generic]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Application/Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.