U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00043-
  • Case Name: Altagracia Claribel Reynoso
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Transfer of Claim]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transfer of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.