U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00252-
  • Case Name: Jennifer R Brooks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Sanctions for Violation of the Discharge Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.