U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00735
  • Case Name: COALITION FOR GREEN CAPITAL v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.