U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00633
  • Case Name: PENDSE v. COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Strike]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 13, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 13, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Injunction]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.