U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03247
  • Case Name: SIEBER et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.